This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 15:28:10 (UTC).

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, as Trustee vs. James D. Haugen et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, as Trustee filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against James D Haugen. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Vlack, Edward. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0209

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Vlack, Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, as Trustee

3217 S Decker Lake Dr., C/O Select Portfolio Servicing

West Valley City, UT 84119

Defendants

Haugen, Nichole

Hudson, WI 54016-1317

Haugen, James D.

Hudson, WI 54016-1317

Haugen, Nichole R.

Hudson, WI 54016-1317

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

1127 Broadway St Ne Apt 310, C/O Csc, Registered Agent

Salem, OR 97301-1139

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foshag, William Nicholas

Defendant Attorney

Cummings, Shannon Kathleen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Vlack, Edward; Additional Text: Signed by EFV on 12/6/21. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Vlack, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: for Petition of Dismissal. Filed by Atty Foshag. srb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: for Dismissal without Prejudice. Filed by Atty Foshag. srb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: Without Prejudice. Filed by Atty Foshag. srb To EFV on 11-24-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on December 13, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 064831, Payable Number: 231305, Receipt Number: 21R 010217, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Filed by Atty. Cummings. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: of Notice of Retainer and Claim for Surplus to Atty. Foshag, James Haugen and Nichole Haugen on 7/12/21. Filed by Atty. Cummings. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Claim for Surplus. Filed by Atty. Cummings. kma to rg on 7/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of S&C, E-Filing Notice and Mediation Program Information upon James D. Haugen on 6/27/21. Filed by Atty. Foshag. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of S&C, E-Filing Notice and Mediation Program Information upon Nichole Haugen a/k/a Nichole R. Haugen by serving James Haugen on 6/27/21. Filed by Atty. Foshag. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of S&C and E-Filing Notice upon Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by serving Audrey Groom on 6/23/21. Filed by Atty. Foshag. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filed by Atty. Foshag. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 054316, Payable Number: 230566, Receipt Number: 21R 008997, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Attachments to S&C - Note, Mortgage, Loan Modification and Lien Report. Filed by Atty. Foshag. kma

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cummings, Shannon Kathleen