This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 22:51:32 (UTC).

Eric P. Hoag vs. Jeff N. Jaques

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Eric P Hoag filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeff N Jaques. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2620

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hoag, Eric P.

Janesville, WI 53548

Defendants

Jacques, Jeff N.

Janesville, WI 53548

Jaques, Jeff N.

Janesville, WI 53548

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DeHorse, David Samuel

Defendant Attorney

Klobucar, Amanda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Renumber to; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 2022CV000059

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Administrative disposition; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and counterclaim; Additional Text: Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim >$10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 10:30 AM Plaintiff Eric P. Hoag appeared by video means. Attorney David Samuel DeHorse appeared by video means for Plaintiff Eric P. Hoag. Defendant Jeff N. Jacques appeared by video means. Attorney Amanda Klobucar appeared by video means for Defendant Jeff N. Jacques. Defendant's counterclaim moves this matter out of Small Claims. Tickler scheduled for February 16, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: Activity: Pretrial conference Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $125.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 084801, Payable Number: 260261, Receipt Number: 22R 000773, Amount: $125.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on January 10, 2022 at 10:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Plaintiff's request to hear Motion at upcoming scheduling conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Jeff N. Jacques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on December 1, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on December 1, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on December 1, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on December 1, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice mailed to Defendant(s): Jeff N Jacques

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Claim for money: $3780.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 832145, Payable Number: 256365, Receipt Number: 21R 033114, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Klobucar, Amanda