This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 17:33:42 (UTC).

EA Properties et al vs. Steven Lamers et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 EA Properties filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Steven Lamers. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, Troy L, Tews, Terrie and Hendrickson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0253

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, Troy L

Tews, Terrie

Hendrickson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Properties, EA

6057 Cocos Dr

Fort Myers, FL 33908

Everett, Matt

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Defendants

Lamers, Steven

New London, WI 54961

Lamers, Steve

New London, WI 54961

Lamers, Karen

New London, WI 54961

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ returned satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000253; Caption: EA Properties et al vs. Steven Lamers et al; Property/Remarks: 1215 W. Beckert Rd. Unit 2, New London, WI 54961; Judgment Party; Party Name: Matt Everett; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3630 Leonard Point Rd., EA Properties, Oshkosh, WI 54904; Judgment Party; Party Name: EA Properties; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6057 Cocos Dr, Fort Myers, FL 33908 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Karen Lamers; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1215 W Beckert Rd, Unit 2, New London, WI 54961 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Steven Lamers; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1215 W Beckert Rd, Unit 2, New London, WI 54961 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie; Additional Text: for eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.; Court Reporter: Feldmann, Jennifer; Additional Text: Matt Everett appeared in person pro se for plaintiff. Defendant Steven Lamers appeared in person pro se. The Court will grant the motion to reopen, and will proceed to an eviction hearing today. Defendant still opposes eviction. Matt Everett was sworn and testified. Steven Lamers was sworn and testified. Exhibit 1 - pet agreement - marked and received. The Court finds that the defendants have violated the lease agreement. The Court grants a judgment of eviction effective July 30, 2021 at noon. Writ of restitution may be issued at that time if the defendants have not vacated the residence.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Reopen; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit #1 - Pet Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion to reopen; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.; Additional Text: with attached letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.; Additional Text: Order on Motion to Reopen Small Claims Judgment - all parties to appear in person

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction hearing; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Court Reporter: Tape Recorded; Additional Text: Matt and Renee Everett appeared by telephone for plaintiffs. No appearance by defendants. Per Ms. Everett, the defendants were not personally served; she used certified mail. Case continued by the Court Commissioner. Plaintiffs to file amended summons and complaint for a new date and then have the defendants personally served either by the sheriff or a private process server.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Copies to plaintiff for personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009245, Payable Number: 153730, Receipt Number: 21R 004148, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Proof of certified mail - 14 day notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: 14 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Mandatory phone appearance sheet for both parties - attach to defendants' service copies.

    Read MoreRead Less