This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 22:02:56 (UTC).

Duke Capital, LLC vs. Cedric Story

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Duke Capital, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cedric Story. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Christensen, Samuel A, Piontek, Michael J and Fredrickson, Jon E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0798

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Christensen, Samuel A

Piontek, Michael J

Fredrickson, Jon E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duke Capital, LLC

225 S Executive Dr

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

STORY, CEDRIC

Racine, WI 53403

Garnishee

Central Transport

11218 W Mitchell St, Attn: Payroll/Garnishments

West Allis, WI 53214

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stueckroth, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 868021, Payable Number: 445473, Receipt Number: 21R 011796F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 868021, Payable Number: 445473, Receipt Number: 21R 011796F, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 236170, Payable Number: 430810, Receipt Number: 21R 003926F, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: RACINE; Case number: 2021SC000798; Caption: Duke Capital, LLC vs. Cedric Story; Total Amount: $1457.69; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Duke Capital, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S Executive Dr, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cedric Story; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2316 ROSALIND AVE, Racine, WI 53403 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1152.19; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $41.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Pltf. by atty. and no app. by deft(s). Zoom appearance. Judgment plus CC granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Piontek, Michael J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on April 15, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $1152.19; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 157979, Payable Number: 428511, Receipt Number: 21R 002670F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stueckroth, Richard E