This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 18:54:53 (UTC).

Douglas Milosavljevic, MD, SC vs. MICHAELE ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Douglas Milosavljevic, MD, SC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAELE ROBINSON. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dowse, Geoffrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0114

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dowse, Geoffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas Milosavljevic, MD, SC

225 S Executive Dr First Floor

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

ROBINSON, MICHAELE

Kenosha, WI 53142

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stueckroth, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 109970, Payable Number: 316631, Receipt Number: 21R 003482, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: KENOSHA; Case number: 2021SC000114; Caption: Douglas Milosavljevic, MD, SC vs. MICHAELE ROBINSON; Total Amount: $9496.63; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: MICHAELE ROBINSON; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5803 68TH ST, Kenosha, WI 53142 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Douglas Milosavljevic, MD, SC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S Executive Dr First Floor, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $9191.13; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $41.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: 04:01 PM Clerk: L.Konken PL appears by Attorney Richard Stueckroth. No appearance by the Defendant. Default money judgment entered plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons & Complaint and zoom notice was served upon Michaele Robinson on 01-23-2021 ($41.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: $9191.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000480, Payable Number: 314879, Receipt Number: 21R 000756, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of proper attire and decorum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: zoom instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stueckroth, Richard E