This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 20:14:26 (UTC).

Donna Schutte vs. Ciox Health, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Donna Schutte filed an Other lawsuit against Ciox Health, LLC. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Carter, Lloyd V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0172

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Carter, Lloyd V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schutte, Donna

Waukesha, WI 53188

Defendants

Ciox Health, LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company, Ra, 8040 Excelsior Dr, Ste 400

Madison, WI 53717

PROHEALTH CARE, INC.

C/O Ct Corporation System, Ra, 301 S. Bedford St., Suite 1

Madison, WI 53703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Foeckler, Allan Michael

Robinson, Edward E.

Eckstein, Brett A

Defendant Attorney

Manna, Daniel A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Additional Text: Notice of removal filed. Dismissed without prejudice. May be reopened if Notice of Removal to the United States District Court has not been allowed or the case has been remanded to the circuit court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of venue, remove to federal court; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Additional Text: This case is dismissed twenty days after the date of this Order unless good cause is shown within the twenty days why this order should not take effect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005882, Payable Number: 429720, Receipt Number: 21R 006883, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Daniel Manna appears for Defendant Ciox Health, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, filed by Atty Manna.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Corporate Service made of Authenticated Summons and Complaint; Electronic Filing Notice on 02/08/2021 to CIOX Health LLC via Registered Agent. Filed by Atty Eckstein.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Corporate Service made of Authenticated Summons and Complaint; Electronic Filing Notice on 02/08/2021 to ProHealth via Researcher. Filed by Atty Eckstein.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Robinson has been retained by the Plaintiff, Donna Schutte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Brett A Eckstein has been retained by the Plaintiff Donna Schutte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Fax dated 2-10-2021, filed by von Briesen & Roper, requesting case documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Fax dated 2-5-2021, filed by Gass Weber Mullins, LLC, requesting case documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Fax dated 2-4-2021, filed by Thomson Reuters, requesting case documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Fax dated 2-3-2021, filed by Ogletree Deakins, requesting case documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 003468, Payable Number: 428142, Receipt Number: 21R 004122, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less