This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 13:55:04 (UTC).

Domestic Linen Supply Co., Inc. vs. Matthew A Marzette

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Domestic Linen Supply Co , Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Matthew A Marzette. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Fredrickson, Jon E and Christensen, Samuel A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1480

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Fredrickson, Jon E

Christensen, Samuel A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Domestic Linen Supply Co., Inc.

4131 N. Ravenswood Avenue

Chicago, IL 60613

Domestic Uniform

4131 N. Ravenswood Avenue

Chicago, IL 60613

Defendants

Marzette, Matthew A

Racine, WI 53403

Marzette Auto Specialists

3164 Drexel Avenue

Racine, WI 53403

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zall, Darrell Robert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 392899, Payable Number: 434910, Receipt Number: 21R 006188F, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: RACINE; Case number: 2021SC001480; Caption: Domestic Linen Supply Co., Inc. vs. Matthew A Marzette; Total Amount: $10109.37; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Domestic Linen Supply Co., Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4131 N. Ravenswood Avenue, Chicago, IL 60613 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Matthew A Marzette; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3164 Drexel Avenue, Racine, WI 53403 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $9801.87; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $43.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Pltf. by atty. and no app. by deft(s). Zoom appearance. Judgment plus CC granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 17, 2021 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $9801.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 314213, Payable Number: 432705, Receipt Number: 21R 004993F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zall, Darrell Robert