This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 01:52:46 (UTC).

DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. vs. N. Robert Byxbe et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against N Robert Byxbe. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Klicko, Wendy J. N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0163

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Klicko, Wendy J. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.

9990 Richmond Avenue, Suite 400, C/O Selene Finance

Houston, TX 77042-4546

Defendants

Byxbe, N. Robert

Baraboo, WI 53913-2458

Byxbe, Karen

Baraboo, WI 53913-2458

State of Wisconsin

114 East State Capitol, C/O Attorney General

Madison, WI 53703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Piette, Robert M

Defendant Attorney

McNeilly, James W., Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Foreclosure; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021CV000163; Caption: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. vs. N. Robert Byxbe et al; Property/Remarks: of Foreclosure in the amount of $134,250.61 for real estate as fully described in the complaint contained in the court file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Klicko, Wendy J. N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Klicko, Wendy J. N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Additional Text: for default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: N. Robert Byxbe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Karen Byxbe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004613, Payable Number: 239448, Receipt Number: 21R 009707, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNeilly, James W., Jr.