This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 14:14:00 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. James Kossel

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Discover Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against James Kossel. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Strasser, Gregory J and Ley, Amanda J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1652

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Strasser, Gregory J

Ley, Amanda J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

C/O Gurstel Law Firm P.C., 622 N Water St #400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Kossel, James

Weston, WI 54476-4795

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharma, Anjali

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MARATHON; Case number: 2021SC001652; Caption: Discover Bank vs. James Kossel; Total Amount: $6538.73; Judgment Party; Party Name: Discover Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Gurstel Law Firm P.C., 622 N Water St #400, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: James Kossel; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 7102 Brianna St, Weston, WI 54476-4795 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6272.23; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Costs and Disbursements; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Exhibit A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Exhibit B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: Attorney Sharma appears for Discover Bank. James Kossel does not appear. Default JU granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Ley, Amanda J.; Additional Text: Case called 10:00 time block in Courtroom A. Clerk: Becca Attorney Hegard appears in person for Discovery Bank. James Kossel appears. Case contested. CT set.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on November 30, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 175333, Payable Number: 268442, Receipt Number: 21R 005621P, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: James Kossel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharma, Anjali