This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 01:16:22 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. DEBRA BOSTER

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEBRA BOSTER. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Voigt, W. Andrew and Whaley, April L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Voigt, W. Andrew

Whaley, April L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

6500 New Albany Road East

New Albany, OH 43054

Defendant

BOSTER, DEBRA

Pardeeville, WI 53954

Garnishees

Walmart Stores, Inc

Po Box 82

Bentonville, AR 72716-0135

Aspirus, Inc.

2200 Westwood Dr.

Wausau, WI 54401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lower, Austin J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010143, Payable Number: 164609, Receipt Number: 21R 016701, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010143, Payable Number: 164609, Receipt Number: 21R 016701, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006875, Payable Number: 161730, Receipt Number: 21R 011781, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006875, Payable Number: 161730, Receipt Number: 21R 011781, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001726, Payable Number: 157042, Receipt Number: 21R 003319, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001726, Payable Number: 157042, Receipt Number: 21R 003319, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001570, Payable Number: 156882, Receipt Number: 21R 002957, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Whaley, April L; Additional Text: Attorney Matthew Prior appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Defendant Debra Boster did not appear in court. Default judgment granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Kohn Law Firm. If judgment is granted, statutory attorney fees be waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Additional Text: 2/5/21 Valerie Tradewell was sub-served the Summons and Complaint for Debra Boster $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000530, Payable Number: 155856, Receipt Number: 21R 000884, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lower, Austin J