This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 01/24/2022 at 00:20:10 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. DANIEL R MALONEY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DANIEL R MALONEY. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Walsh, Thomas J and Vander Leest, John A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0842

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Walsh, Thomas J

Vander Leest, John A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

6500 New Albany Road

New Albany, OH 43054

Defendant

MALONEY, DANIEL R

Green Bay, WI 54301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lower, Austin J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Vander Leest, John A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Walsh, Thomas J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BROWN; Case number: 2021CV000842; Caption: DISCOVER BANK vs. DANIEL R MALONEY; Total Amount: $10505.66; Judgment Party; Party Name: DISCOVER BANK; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6500 NEW ALBANY ROAD, New Albany, OH 43054 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: DANIEL R MALONEY; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1150 DOTY ST, Green Bay, WI 54301 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $10505.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Walsh, Thomas J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons; Additional Text: Publication Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Daniel Maloney not served (Efiling Notice, Summons & Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 020154, Payable Number: 328282, Receipt Number: 21R 027173, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lower, Austin J