This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 12:41:50 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. BENNIE J. ALLEN

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Discover Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BENNIE J ALLEN. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kerkman, Chad G, Dowse, Geoffrey and Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0411

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kerkman, Chad G

Dowse, Geoffrey

Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

C/O Zwicker & Associates, P.C., 11414 W. Park Place, Suite 231

Milwaukee, WI 53224

Defendant

ALLEN, BENNIE J.

Kenosha, WI 53142

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kowalewski, Chad F

Defendant Attorneys

Skatrud, Arne Richard

Robbins, Nicole L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca; Additional Text: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Attorney Kowalewski requesting Amended Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 503815, Payable Number: 329179, Receipt Number: 21R 026450, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: another order was signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: KENOSHA; Case number: 2021SC000411; Caption: Discover Bank vs. BENNIE J. ALLEN; Total Amount: $8815.59; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: BENNIE J. ALLEN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6040 30TH AVENUE, Kenosha, WI 53142 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Discover Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C., 11414 W. Park Place, Suite 231, Milwaukee, WI 53224 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $8815.59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Additional Text: Agreed Judgment Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Summary of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 165716, Payable Number: 318218, Receipt Number: 21R 007125, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons & Complaint was served upon Bennie J. Allen on 02-23-2021 (duplicate with costs listed submitted on 05-14-2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: $8601.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of proper attire and decorum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: zoom instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 109620, Payable Number: 316373, Receipt Number: 21R 003074, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robbins, Nicole L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Skatrud, Arne Richard