This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/07/2022 at 12:45:15 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. ANGELA FISCHETTI

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELA FISCHETTI. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Clussman, Vicki L, Vedral, Doreen and Tews, Terrie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0421

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Clussman, Vicki L

Vedral, Doreen

Tews, Terrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

6500 New Albany Road

New Albany, OH 43054

Defendant

FISCHETTI, ANGELA

Iola, WI 54945

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001971, Payable Number: 159317, Receipt Number: 22R 000582, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000421; Caption: DISCOVER BANK vs. ANGELA FISCHETTI; Total Amount: $5324.66; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: DISCOVER BANK; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6500 NEW ALBANY ROAD, New Albany, OH 43054 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: ANGELA FISCHETTI; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO BOX 78, E2060 TRESNESS RD, Iola, WI 54945 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $5203.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Clussman, Vicki L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Clussman, Vicki L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Clussman, Vicki L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Non-Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Clussman, Vicki L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Clussman, Vicki L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Case continued to 9-27-21 at attorney request, for possible stip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014930, Payable Number: 155908, Receipt Number: 21R 007923, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hermersmann, Jason Donald