This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 21:24:19 (UTC).

Discover Bank c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C. vs. Tamara Laskowski

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Discover Bank c/o Zwicker Associates, P C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tamara Laskowski. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Voigt, W. Andrew and Whaley, April L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0372

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Voigt, W. Andrew

Whaley, April L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

11414 West Park Place Suite 202

Milwaukee, WI 53224

Defendant

Laskowski, Tamara

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kowalewski, Chad F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005202, Payable Number: 160209, Receipt Number: 21R 009297, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: COLUMBIA; Case number: 2021SC000372; Caption: Discover Bank c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C. vs. Tamara Laskowski; Total Amount: $2658.59; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Discover Bank c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 11414 West Park Place Suite 202, Milwaukee, WI 53224 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Tamara Laskowski; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 615 Church Street, Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2287.09; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $102.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Whaley, April L; Additional Text: Ashley Achterberg appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Defendant Tamara Laskowski did not appear in court. Default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Voigt, W. Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Additional Text: 6/7/21 Terry Laskowski was sub-served the Summons and Complaint for Tamara Laskowski $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: w/ attached Exhibit A - Cardmember Agreement & Exhibit B - Account Summary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004207, Payable Number: 159248, Receipt Number: 21R 007656, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kowalewski, Chad F