This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 00:50:35 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK c/o Discover Products Inc. vs. RONALD BREMER

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 DISCOVER BANK c/o Discover Products Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against RONALD BREMER. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schumacher, Michael A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0322

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schumacher, Michael A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK c/o Discover Products Inc.

2500 Lake Park Blvd

Salt Lake City, UT 84120

Defendant

BREMER, RONALD

Fairchild, WI 54741

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fingert, Evan R

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Schumacher, Michael A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: by Atty Paleka for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of dismissal; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Application for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Schumacher, Michael A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed due to bankruptcy; Court Official: Schumacher, Michael A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to Rausch Sturm re Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Party To Serve: Ronald Bremer Document Served: Summons and Complaint, Exhibits, Declaration of Nonmilitary Service and Electronic Filing Notice Date Served: 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 213875, Payable Number: 259277, Receipt Number: 21R 018064, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Document named Exhibit- loan documents

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fingert, Evan R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A