This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 04:46:00 (UTC).

Dells Animal Hospital INC vs. MICHAEL H JANECHEK et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Dells Animal Hospital INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL H JANECHEK. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is O'Rourke, Debra V. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1251

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

O'Rourke, Debra V

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dells Animal Hospital INC

4135 Highway 13

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Defendants

JANECHEK, MICHAEL H

Reedsburg, WI 53959

JANECHEK, ANITA L

Reedsburg, WI 53959

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salna, Vytas P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014425, Payable Number: 246166, Receipt Number: 21R 023576, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021SC001251; Caption: Dells Animal Hospital INC vs. MICHAEL H JANECHEK et al; Total Amount: $1545.55; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: MICHAEL H JANECHEK; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 110 MAPLE ST, Reedsburg, WI 53959 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: ANITA L JANECHEK; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 110 MAPLE ST, Reedsburg, WI 53959 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Dells Animal Hospital INC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4135 Highway 13, Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1161.05; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $120.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: O'Rourke, Debra V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: on Anita L. Janechek; $60.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: on Michael H. Janechek; $60.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Money demand for $1,161.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 012484, Payable Number: 244706, Receipt Number: 21R 020615, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salna, Vytas P.