This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 23:06:24 (UTC).

Cynthia Wollner vs. Schanen Enterprises, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Cynthia Wollner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schanen Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Snow, Kristine A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0202

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Snow, Kristine A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wollner, Cynthia

Theresa, WI 53091

Defendants

Schanen Enterprises, Inc.

131 East Main Street, C/O Nicholas S. Perry, Reg Ag

Campbellsport, WI 53010

S&P Variety, Inc.

131 East Main Street, C/O Christopher Schanen-Reg Ag

Campbellsport, WI 53010

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

301 S. Bedford Street, Ste. 1, C/O Ct Corp System, Reg Agent

Madison, WI 53703

ABC Insurance Company

A Currently Unknown, Fictitious Insurance Company

Xxx, WI 00000

The Landmark Credit Union Group Health Benefit Plan

5445 South Westridge Drive, C/O Landmark Cu-Agt Svc Of Pr

New Berlin, WI 53151

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrykus, Daniel Paul

Defendant Attorneys

Testolin, Michael Anthony

Falk, Matthew Robert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final pre-trial; Court Official: Snow, Kristine A.; Location: Circuit Court Branch 4; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - defendant; Additional Text: UMR's Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to Judge Snow filing Plaintiff's Amended Designation of Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - plaintiff; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Amended Designation of Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to Judge Snow filing Plaintiff's Designation of Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: by defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 071948, Payable Number: 232450, Receipt Number: 21R 012775, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling order; Court Official: Snow, Kristine A.; Additional Text: Case Management and Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to Clerk filing Plaintiff's Answers to Landmark's Counterclaim and Cross-Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Schanen, S&P and Hartford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to Clerk filing Affidavits of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Schanen Enterprises, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: The Landmark Credit Union Group Health Benefit Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: S&P Variety, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 040865, Payable Number: 229629, Receipt Number: 21R 007879, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter to COC filing Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Falk, Matthew Robert