This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 13:35:55 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. Natalie F Juarez

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Natalie F Juarez. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca and Dowse, Geoffrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0612

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca

Dowse, Geoffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

622 N Water St #400, C/O Gurstel Law Firm

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Juarez, Natalie F

Kenosha, WI 53142

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaminsky, Stephen M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Matoska-Mentink, Rebecca; Additional Text: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Gurstel requesting amended Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: KENOSHA; Case number: 2021SC000612; Caption: Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. Natalie F Juarez; Total Amount: $4809.07; Judgment Party; Party Name: Natalie F Juarez; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 4702 76th St, Kenosha, WI 53142 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Crown Asset Management, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 622 N Water St #400, c/o Gurstel Law Firm, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $4461.44; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $40.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $43.13; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-06-30; Type: Amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: 11:13 AM Clerk: L.Konken Plaintiff appears by Attorney Sharma. No appearance by the Defendant. Default money judgment entered plus costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: $43.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint and zoom instructions as to Natalie F. Juarez on 04-15-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: hearing to be held on 05-06-2021 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Court Reporter: CD; Additional Text: 10:03 AM Clerk HMcBride. Plaintiff appears by Attorney Anthony Procaccio. No service. Adjmt granted. Adjourned return date scheduled for May 6, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: zoom instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint as to Natalie F. Juarez ($40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Dowse, Geoffrey; Additional Text: $4461.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 111371, Payable Number: 317705, Receipt Number: 21R 005903, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of proper attire and decorum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: zoom instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaminsky, Stephen M.