This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 01:08:40 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. MONICA PAVWOSKI

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONICA PAVWOSKI. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0151

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd, Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

PAVWOSKI, MONICA

Waukesha, WI 53189

Garnishee

USPS Manager

Eagan, MN 55121-9650

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bowlin, Brandon Eugene

Thielhelm, Paul H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Earnings Garnishment Notice, filed by Attorney Paul H. Thielhelm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 035283, Payable Number: 446684, Receipt Number: 21R 038547, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 035283, Payable Number: 446684, Receipt Number: 21R 038547, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 029062, Payable Number: 443146, Receipt Number: 21R 031715, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Debtor Monica Pavwoski and Garnishee USPS Manager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 016905, Payable Number: 435894, Receipt Number: 21R 018327, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 016905, Payable Number: 435894, Receipt Number: 21R 018327, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC000151; Caption: Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. MONICA PAVWOSKI; Total Amount: $2352.33; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: MONICA PAVWOSKI; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: S47W24985 LAWNSDALE RD, Waukesha, WI 53189 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Crown Asset Management, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3100 BRECKINRIDGE BLVD, STE 725, Duluth, GA 30096 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1967.83; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $120.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Non-Service: Attempted service of an Authenticated Summons and Complaint as to the defendant, Monica Pavwoski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint: $1,967.83 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Monica Pavwoski Service as to: Monica Pavwoski All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $60.00/$60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002465, Payable Number: 427411, Receipt Number: 21R 003026, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit - summary of account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Monica Pavwoski

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bowlin, Brandon Eugene

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thielhelm, Paul H.