This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 09:10:07 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. John D Young

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against John D Young. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Novak, Nathan E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0154

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Novak, Nathan E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd, Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

YOUNG, JOHN D

Eau Claire, WI 54703-4010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fingert, Evan R

Thielhelm, Paul H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: of Attorney Paul Thielhelm on behalf of Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 177248, Payable Number: 257437, Receipt Number: 21R 013536, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: EAU CLAIRE; Case number: 2021SC000154; Caption: Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. John D Young; Total Amount: $2049.99; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: John D Young; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1137 WEDGEWOOD AVE, Eau Claire, WI 54703-4010 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Crown Asset Management, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3100 BRECKINRIDGE BLVD, STE 725, DULUTH, GA 30096 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1778.49; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.; Additional Text: 9:30 AM All parties and court personnel appear via Zoom. Attorney Evan R Fingert appeared by video means for Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC. Defendant John D Young not in court. Default judgment granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Small Claims Deputy Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Amount: $1778.49; Additional Text: $2.00 mail fee provided for defendant(s), mailed defendant's copies on 02/02/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to parties with instructions for remote appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 035075, Payable Number: 253156, Receipt Number: 21R 002331, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Attachment to Summons & Complaint - Scheels Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thielhelm, Paul H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fingert, Evan R