This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 06:27:20 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. BRITTANY HOLSTEN

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRITTANY HOLSTEN. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Lowe, Lori J and Kujak, Angela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0719

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Lowe, Lori J

Kujak, Angela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd, Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

HOLSTEN, BRITTANY

Necedah, WI 54646

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: NEJ & Financial Disc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Lowe, Lori J.; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 009725, Payable Number: 129761, Receipt Number: 22R 000377, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: JUNEAU; Case number: 2021SC000719; Caption: Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. BRITTANY HOLSTEN; Total Amount: $987.14; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: BRITTANY HOLSTEN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N10001 PINECONE CT, Necedah, WI 54646 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Crown Asset Management, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3100 BRECKINRIDGE BLVD, STE 725, Duluth, GA 30096 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $815.64; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2022-01-11; Type: Amended judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder; Additional Text: 01:26 PM Attorney Kayla A Paleka in court by letter for Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC. Defendant BRITTANY HOLSTEN not in court. COURT: Default Judgment plus statutory costs/attorney fees were granted to Plaintiff against Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Kujak, Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: FILED BY ATTY PALEKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kujak, Angela; Additional Text: On 11-4-2021 authenticated copies of the Summons and Complaint were mailed to Defendant and E-filed to Atty Paleka.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 098005, Payable Number: 128807, Receipt Number: 21R 007833, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: BRITTANY HOLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A