This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 10:29:07 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of WebBank vs. ROY TADDEY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of WebBank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROY TADDEY. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0398

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of WebBank

3100 Breckinridge Blvd, Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

TADDEY, ROY

Mukwonago, WI 53149-9116

Garnishee

Bill Schneider, Inc.

S84 W18753 Saturn Dr.

Muskego, WI 53150

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thielhelm, Paul H.

Bowlin, Brandon Eugene

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 021969, Payable Number: 438923, Receipt Number: 21R 024074, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Debtor Roy Taddey and Garnishee Bill Schneider, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 017386, Payable Number: 436159, Receipt Number: 21R 018731, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 017386, Payable Number: 436159, Receipt Number: 21R 018731, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2021SC000398; Caption: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of WebBank vs. ROY TADDEY; Total Amount: $1817.86; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: ROY TADDEY; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: S105W29893 CIRCLE DR, Mukwonago, WI 53149-9116; Judgment Party; Party Name: Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of WebBank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3100 BRECKINRIDGE BLVD, STE 725, Duluth, GA 30096 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1433.36; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $120.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: dated 4/19/21 filed by Attorney Thielhelm requesting judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Non-Service: Attempted service of an Authenticated Summons and Complaint as to the defendant, Roy Taddey. Filed by Attorney Brandon E. Bowlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 1,433.36 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Roy Taddey Service as to: Roy Taddey All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $60.00/$60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004109, Payable Number: 428567, Receipt Number: 21R 004895, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit - Borrower Registration Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Roy Taddey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bowlin, Brandon Eugene

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thielhelm, Paul H.