This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 01:24:04 (UTC).

CreteStone Properties, LLC vs. James Walter Stanley

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 CreteStone Properties, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against James Walter Stanley. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Radtke, Pamela, Horne, Scott L and Wickler, Jody R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1021

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Radtke, Pamela

Horne, Scott L

Wickler, Jody R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CreteStone Properties, LLC

115 Buol Road

West Salem, WI 54669

Defendant

Stanley, James Walter

La Crosse, WI 54603

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC001021; Caption: CreteStone Properties, LLC vs. James Walter Stanley; Total Amount: $2944.5; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: 1212 Kane Street La Crosse WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: James Walter Stanley; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1212 Kane Stree, La Crosse, WI 54603 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: CreteStone Properties, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 115 Buol Road, West Salem, WI 54669 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2800.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC001021; Caption: CreteStone Properties, LLC vs. James Walter Stanley; Property/Remarks: HOME ADDRESS 1212 Kane Street La Crosse WI 54603 STORAGE UNIT #69 N4571 CO RD M WEST SALEM WI 54669; Judgment Party; Party Name: James Walter Stanley; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1212 Kane Stree, La Crosse, WI 54603 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: CreteStone Properties, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 115 Buol Road, West Salem, WI 54669 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Horne, Scott L; Additional Text: no answer filed, default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Radtke, Pamela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 011126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Radtke, Pamela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005969, Payable Number: 184811, Receipt Number: 21R 010091, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Account Statement

    Read MoreRead Less