This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 21:27:41 (UTC).

Creative Finance, Inc. vs. Norman Wayne Krukowski Jr & Jessica Lynn Krukowski

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Creative Finance, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Norman Wayne Krukowski Jr Jessica Lynn Krukowski. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Pfitzinger, Brian A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0761

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Pfitzinger, Brian A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creative Finance, Inc.

815 Business Park Road, Po Box 454

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Defendants

Krukowski, Norman Wayne, Jr

Fox Lake, WI 53933

Krukowski, Jessica Lynn

Fox Lake, WI 53933

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Tera D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Mayville Engineering Co., $10,331.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000030, Payable Number: 237669, Receipt Number: 21R 022472, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $210.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000030, Payable Number: 237669, Receipt Number: 21R 022472, Amount: $210.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 126425, Payable Number: 237376, Receipt Number: 21R 022080, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC000761; Caption: Creative Finance, Inc. vs. Norman Wayne Krukowski Jr & Jessica Lynn Krukowski; Total Amount: $9980.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Creative Finance, Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 815 Business Park Road, PO Box 454, Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jessica Lynn Krukowski; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 303 South Depot Street, Fox Lake, WI 53933 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Norman Wayne Krukowski Jr; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 303 South Depot Street, Fox Lake, WI 53933 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $9596.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $120.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Based on Noncompliance For Money Judgment Non-Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Court Reporter: Mountin, Maria; Additional Text: Defendant Jessica Lynn Krukowski in court. Defendant Norman Wayne Krukowski in court. Attorney Tera D Johnson in court for Plaintiff Creative Finance, Inc.. Parties reached agreement and filed Stipulation. Court approves and signs Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Norman Krukowski, $60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Jessica Krukowski, $60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Additional Text: $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 071635, Payable Number: 232079, Receipt Number: 21R 012084, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Jessica Krukowski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Norman Krukowski Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less