This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 01:23:43 (UTC).

Creative Finance, Inc. vs. John William Copper & Madonna A. Copper

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Creative Finance, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John William Copper Madonna A Copper. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Goyette, Kelly A, Doyle, Gloria L and Wickler, Jody R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1022

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Goyette, Kelly A

Doyle, Gloria L

Wickler, Jody R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creative Finance, Inc.

815 Business Park Road, Po Box 454

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Defendants

Copper, John William

La Crosse, WI 54601

Copper, Madonna Ann

La Crosse, WI 54601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Tera D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of replevin; Court Official: Goyette, Kelly A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of replevin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC001022; Caption: Creative Finance, Inc. vs. John William Copper & Madonna A. Copper; Total Amount: $534.5; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: 2013 KIA FORTE EX: VIN: KNAFU4A26D5713545; Judgment Party; Party Name: John William Copper; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1803 Kane Street, La Crosse, WI 54601 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Madonna Ann Copper; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1803 Kane Street, La Crosse, WI 54601 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Creative Finance, Inc.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 815 Business Park Road, PO Box 454, Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $115.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $300.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.; Additional Text: no answer filed, default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007051, Payable Number: 185694, Receipt Number: 21R 011633, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: $30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: $85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005980, Payable Number: 184821, Receipt Number: 21R 010112, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Noelle Grubbs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less