This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 06:35:39 (UTC).

COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC vs. KAYLA A ROSS

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against KAYLA A ROSS. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Needham, Scott and Heckmann, Timothy C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Needham, Scott

Heckmann, Timothy C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC

1901 Gateway Dr #200

Irving, TX 75038

THE CASH STORE A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1901 Gateway Dr #200

Irving, TX 75038

Defendant

ROSS, KAYLA A

New Richmond, WI 54017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: for Transcipt for issuance into Polk County WI at the request of Kohn Law Firm. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 021407, Payable Number: 226999, Receipt Number: 21R 003274, Amount: $5.00 pd by Atty Hermersmann. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: filed by the DE. ec: Atty. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: ST CROIX; Case number: 2021SC000080; Caption: COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC vs. KAYLA A ROSS; Total Amount: $1925.15; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1901 GATEWAY DR #200, Irving, TX 75038 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: KAYLA A ROSS; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2293 80TH ST, New Richmond, WI 54017 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1653.65; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-08-25; Type: Transcript issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.; Additional Text: 01:43 PM CO: Timothy C. Heckmann, Clerk: K Kittel. Attorney Austin Lower appeared by video means for Plaintiff COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC. Defendant KAYLA A ROSS appeared by phone means. Court reviews case and confirms address of DE. DE does not dispute. PL requests judgment; Court GRANTS judgment in the amount requested plus costs. DE may set up a post-judgment payment plan if they'd like. Adjourned at 1:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Heckmann, Timothy C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: Service of Summons and Complaint by regular mail. Filed by the PL. ec: PL, c: DE w/zoom info. kak ($1653.65)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010383, Payable Number: 225771, Receipt Number: 21R 001378, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: for Kayla Ross filed by Atty Hermersmann. kak

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hermersmann, Jason Donald