This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 23:52:08 (UTC).

COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC vs. EDWARD J STEMWEDEL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDWARD J STEMWEDEL. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Huber, Raymond, Vedral, Doreen and Tews, Terrie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0590

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Huber, Raymond

Vedral, Doreen

Tews, Terrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC

1901 Gateway Dr #200

Irving, TX 75038

THE CASH STORE A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1901 Gateway Dr #200

Irving, TX 75038

Defendant

STEMWEDEL, EDWARD J

New London, WI 54961

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Garnishee defendant is Neenah Foundry Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 028143, Payable Number: 158762, Receipt Number: 21R 012392, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 028143, Payable Number: 158762, Receipt Number: 21R 012392, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 028037, Payable Number: 158709, Receipt Number: 21R 012283, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Huber, Raymond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000590; Caption: COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC vs. EDWARD J STEMWEDEL; Total Amount: $1319.66; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WI LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1901 GATEWAY DR #200, IRVING, TX 75038 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: EDWARD J STEMWEDEL; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: E9214A COUNTY ROAD T, New London, WI 54961 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1048.16; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen; Additional Text: Atty. Hermersmann appeared by letter. No appearance by defendant. Default judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 023807, Payable Number: 158016, Receipt Number: 21R 010985, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hermersmann, Jason Donald