This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/02/2022 at 21:17:37 (UTC).

Corey D. Schmidt et al vs. Todd Alan Hanrahan et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Corey D Schmidt filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Todd Alan Hanrahan. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0204

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schmidt, Corey D.

Stitzer, WI 53825

Schmidt, Michelle A.

Stitzer, WI 53825

Defendants

Hanrahan, Todd Alan

Boscobel, WI 53805

Hanrahan, Emily Rose

Lancaster, WI 53813

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: Request to remove contempt hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Contempt hearing on October 25, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contempt hearing; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: 2:00 PM Plaintiff Corey D. Schmidt not in court, Plaintiff Michelle A. Schmidt not in court, Defendant Todd Alan Hanrahan appeared LATE in court, Defendant Emily Rose Hanrahan appeared by video. Court questioned parties regarding FDS. New FDS will be provided to the parties to complete and submit to the Plaintiff. Emily was to mail $35.60 and Todd $20 to the plaintiffs along with FDS for Service Fees for this contempt. Court will continue to 10/25/21 at 9:30 to see if parties have complied. Contempt hearing scheduled for October 25, 2021 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Hanrahan, Todd Alan; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Todd Alan Hanrahan Current: 6590 River View Ln B1, BOSCOBEL, WI 53805 United States (Effective: 03-15-2021) Prior: 11870 Borah Rd, Lancaster, WI 53813 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Hanrahan, Emily Rose; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Emily Rose Hanrahan Current: 1261 Ridge Ave, Lancaster, WI 53813 United States (Effective: 03-15-2021) Prior: 11870 Borah Rd, Lancaster, WI 53813 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: - Todd A. Hanrahan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $35.6; Additional Text: - Emily R. Hanrahan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion and order for hearing on contempt; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Additional Text: Todd Hanrahan Todd Hanrahan

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GRANT; Case number: 2021SC000204; Caption: Corey D. Schmidt et al vs. Todd Alan Hanrahan et al; Total Amount: $3643.36; Judgment Party; Party Name: Todd Alan Hanrahan; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6590 River View Ln B1, BOSCOBEL, WI 53805; Judgment Party; Party Name: Emily Rose Hanrahan; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1261 Ridge Ave, Lancaster, WI 53813; Judgment Party; Party Name: Corey D. Schmidt; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: P.O. Box 6, Stitzer, WI 53825; Judgment Party; Party Name: Michelle A. Schmidt; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: P.O. Box 6, Stitzer, WI 53825; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3544.86; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $4.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: Court is held by Zoom. Plaintiff Corey D. Schmidt appeared by video means. Defendant Todd Alan Hanrahan not in court. Defendant Emily Rose Hanrahan not in court. Plaintiff requests default. Court grants default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $98.5

    Read MoreRead Less