This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 17:16:57 (UTC).

Cobb Shipping Service LLC vs. Zachary P Womack et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 Cobb Shipping Service LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Zachary P Womack. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Day, Craig R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0126

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Day, Craig R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobb Shipping Service LLC

Po Box 148, 401 Welch Street

Rewey, WI 53580

Defendants

Womack, Zachary P

Lancaster, WI 53813

Womack, Lisa

Platteville, WI 53818

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Kieler, Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006567, Payable Number: 147391, Receipt Number: 21R 008489, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction; Amount: $2873.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contempt hearing; Court Official: Day, Craig R; Court Reporter: Wiest, Nichole; Additional Text: Attorney Ryan Kieler appeared in person on behalf of Defendants. Indicated he was advised by his clients that this matter was paod in full. Court advised to reach out to Plaintiff to file proper satisfaction. Based upon the Plaintiff's failure to appear the Motion for Contempt is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion and order for hearing on contempt; Court Official: Day, Craig R; Additional Text: cc'd copies to plaintiff for service..ep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 006798

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001641, Payable Number: 143990, Receipt Number: 21R 001953, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Additional Text: $94.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less