This case was last updated from Waupaca County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 22:09:03 (UTC).

Clintonville Family Dentistry, S.C. et al vs. Kati A Guseck

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Clintonville Family Dentistry, S C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kati A Guseck. This case was filed in Waupaca County Courts, Waupaca County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, Troy L, Vedral, Doreen and Tews, Terrie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0380

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waupaca, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, Troy L

Vedral, Doreen

Tews, Terrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clintonville Area Ambulance Service

112 S Main St

Clintonville, WI 54929

Appleton Emergency Services

298 S Yonge St

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Clintonville Family Dentistry, S.C.

112 S Main St

Clintonville, WI 54929

Defendant

Guseck, Kati A

Clintonville, WI 54929

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fletcher, Christopher Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Transcript of judgment issued; Additional Text: to be filed in Shawano County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 010079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Defendant's envelope containing judgment and FDS was returned by the post office, unable to forward.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Tews, Terrie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUPACA; Case number: 2021SC000380; Caption: Clintonville Family Dentistry, S.C. et al vs. Kati A Guseck; Total Amount: $1150.68; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clintonville Family Dentistry, S.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 112 S Main St, Clintonville, WI 54929 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Appleton Emergency Services; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 298 S Yonge St, Ormond Beach, FL 32174 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Kati A Guseck; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N10765 Lakeshore Rd, Clintonville, WI 54929 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $884.14; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $100.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $50.04; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-10-01; Type: Transcript issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Vedral, Doreen; Additional Text: Attorney Christopher Lee Fletcher appeared by letter for Clintonville Family Dentistry, S.C., Defendant Kati A Guseck not in court. Default judgment entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Nielsen, Troy L.; Additional Text: Order Amending Caption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Envelope containing summons and complaint for the defendant was returned by the post office, unable to forward. Case continued to 8-23-21 for amended summons and service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014454, Payable Number: 155434, Receipt Number: 21R 006993, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance and request for Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fletcher, Christopher Lee