This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 00:49:10 (UTC).

Clifford A. Lee et al vs. Julianna Strebe

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Clifford A Lee filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Julianna Strebe. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoel, Kari S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0675

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hoel, Kari S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lee, Clifford A.

Holmen, WI 54636

Lee, Sharon L.

Holmen, WI 54636

C & S Rentals

1606 Prairie Place, #112

Holmen, WI 54636

Defendants

Strebe, Julianne

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Strebe, Julianna

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruder, Tanya M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: to defendant, Julianna Strebe returned by USPS marked "Return to Sender; Vacant; Unable to Forward" - Amended Notice of Entry of Judgment and Order for Financial Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Additional Text: Attorney Tanya Bruder appeared for plaintiffs; defendant did not appear; default judgment for money granted in favor of plaintiff; minutes filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: of Small Claims - Claim published in Chippewa Herald on 12/02/2021 for Defendant(s) - Service fee $ 31.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: autheticated copy of Amended Summons and Complain, Electronic Filing Notice, Chippewa County Small Claims Rules: Julianna Strebe on 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: to defendant, Julianna Stebe returned by USPS marked "Return to Sender; Unable to Forward" - Summons and Complaint and Electronic Filing Notice - NOTE: Plaintiff to notify clerk how to proceed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $2.0; Additional Text: Regular Mail Fee Paid - for 10-26-2021 Amended Summons & Complaint 21R 016513

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Chippewa County Small Claims Rules attached to Summons and Complaint for mailing to defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.; Additional Text: Regular mail - Plaintiff owes $ 2.00 mail fee; notified Plaintiff to upload Chippewa Co. Small Claims Rules; mail fee paid on 10-29-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2021SC000675; Caption: Clifford A. Lee et al vs. Julianna Strebe; Total Amount: $7645.37; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment. Restitution of the following premises to wit: 210 1/2 East Grand Avenue, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729 Plaintiff has 30 days after vacancy to amend for damages and costs. 12/20/2021: Judgment amended to include monetary damages & costs.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clifford A. Lee; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1606 Prairie Place, #112, Holmen, WI 54636 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Sharon L. Lee; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1606 Prairie Place, #112, Holmen, WI 54636 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Julianna Strebe; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 210 1/2 East Grand Avenue, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $7157.2; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $213.67; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-10-06; Type: Writ of restitution; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-10-19; Type: Writ returned fully satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.; Additional Text: Attorney Tanya Bruder appeared for plaintiffs; plaintiff, Sharon Lee appeared; defendant did not appear; default judgment of eviction granted; Plaintiff given 30 days to amend Summons and Complaint for damages and costs; return date of 12/20/2021 at 1:00 p.m.; Notice of hearing to be served with Writ @ Sheriff's Dept.; minutes filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of Small Claims Summons and Complaint, Small Claims Rules Chippewa County, Electronic Filing Notice and Letter to Small Claims Clerk posted on 09/19/2021; copy mailed on 9/20/2021 - Service Fee: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Chippewa County Small Claims Rulesto be attached to Summons and Complaint for service upon defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Attorney Tanya Bruder correcting defendant's name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.; Additional Text: Personal Service NOTE: Chippewa County Small Claims Rules were not attatched; notified Plaintiff to upload and attach to Summons and Complaint for service upon defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 138405, Payable Number: 157247, Receipt Number: 21R 014343, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruder, Tanya M.