This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/08/2022 at 16:49:37 (UTC).

Clearpointe Capital, LLC vs. Kris J. Ricard et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Clearpointe Capital, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kris J Ricard. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Cross, Troy D and Von Hoff, Andrea E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0676

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Cross, Troy D

Von Hoff, Andrea E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clearpointe Capital, LLC

N86 W14041 Beacon Street

Menomonee Falls, WI 53051

Defendants

Ricard, Kris J.

Fall River, WI 53932

Hederer-Moore, Angel S.

Fall River, WI 53932

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Seitz, Michael K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Cross, Troy D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: COLUMBIA; Case number: 2021SC000676; Caption: Clearpointe Capital, LLC vs. Kris J. Ricard et al; Property/Remarks: 1984 Friendship 14' x 70' manufactured home Serial No. 1432V; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clearpointe Capital, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N86 W14041 Beacon Street, Menomonee Falls, WI 53051 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Kris J. Ricard; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 601 N. Main Street, Site #35, Fall River, WI 53932 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Angel S. Hederer-Moore; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 601 N. Main Street, Site #35, Fall River, WI 53932 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Judgment and Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment/judgment; Court Official: Cross, Troy D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court commissioner hearing; Court Official: Cross, Troy D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Replevin return date; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Additional Text: Attorney Michael K. Seitz appeared in court for Clearpointe Capital, LLC, Defendant Kris J. Ricard not in court, Defendant Angel S. Hederer-Moore not in court. Due to non-appearance by the defendants, default judgment granted. Attorney Seitz to draft the replevin judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Additional Text: 10/27/21 Kris Ricard, co resident, was personally served the Summons and Complaint for Angel Hederer-Moore $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: 10/27/21 Kris Ricard was personally served the Summons and Complaint $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008355, Payable Number: 163174, Receipt Number: 21R 014228, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: as to Angel Hederer-Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: as to Kris Ricard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seitz, Michael K.