This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 01:17:04 (UTC).

Clean Water Corp of America et al vs. Jason Felt et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Clean Water Corp of America filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason Felt. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Ziegler, Todd L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0035

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Ziegler, Todd L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clean Water Corp of America

Po Box 2288

La Crosse, WI 54602

Southwest Sanitation LLC

Po Box 2288

La Crosse, WI 54602

Culligan

Po Box 2288

La Crosse, WI 54602

Defendants

Felt, Jason

Sparta, WI 54656

Felt, Susan

Sparta, WI 54656

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gingrasso, Anthony Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L; Additional Text: for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Ziegler, Todd L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: for adjournment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on February 22, 2021 at 01:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000397, Payable Number: 159093, Receipt Number: 21RT000291, Amount: $118.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gingrasso, Anthony Ryan