This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 02:28:38 (UTC).

City of Two Rivers Municipal Court vs. Kristin R. Snyder

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 City of Two Rivers Municipal Court filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Kristin R Snyder. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Rohrer, Mark R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0421

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Rohrer, Mark R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Two Rivers Municipal Court

1717 East Park Street, P.O. Box 87

Two Rivers, WI 54241

Defendant

Snyder, Kristin R.

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lambert, Michael E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Rohrer, Mark R.; Additional Text: Dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Rohrer, Mark R.; Court Reporter: Fritz, Denise; Additional Text: 9:15 AM Attorney Michael E Lambert appeared in court for City of Two Rivers Municipal Court Defendant Kristin R. Snyder not in court. This matter was scheduled for 9:00 a.m., it is now 9:16 a.m., and the Defendant has failed to appear. The Defendant filed her Notice of Appeal with the Clerk of Court Office, however failed to notify the Municipal Court, which is required under statute. The Court dismisses this matter. Adj. 9:18 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Rohrer, Mark R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Notice of Motion and Motion, etc., served on Kristin Snyder, on 11/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Michael E. Lambert appears for Plaintiff, Village of Mishicot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: to Dismiss Appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Michael E. Lambert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Right to Appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Entire file from Two Rivers Municipal Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to COC from Municipal Court Judge, re: appeal request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: 21R 014124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lambert, Michael E