This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 09:16:20 (UTC).

Chitwood, Nicol & Matthews LLC vs. Paul Betts

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Chitwood, Nicol Matthews LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Paul Betts. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Goodman, Mark L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0074

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Goodman, Mark L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chitwood, Nicol & Matthews LLC

Po Box 606, 214 Larkin St

Tomah, WI 54660

Defendant

Betts, Paul

Tomah, WI 54660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21RG003667

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: CREDITOR: Chitwood, Nicol & Matthews LLC CREDITOR ATTY: DEBTOR: Paul Betts GARNISHEE: Tomah VA Medical Center ORIGINAL JUDGMENT: 454.06 AMT OWED: 454.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21RT000967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MONROE; Case number: 2021SC000074; Caption: Chitwood, Nicol & Matthews LLC vs. Paul Betts; Total Amount: $449.06; Satisfaction: Full; Judgment Party; Party Name: Paul Betts; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 314 Cady Ave, Tomah, WI 54660; Judgment Party; Party Name: Chitwood, Nicol & Matthews LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO BOX 606, 214 Larkin St, Tomah, WI 54660; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $352.56; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $96.5; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-08-30; Type: Full satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.; Additional Text: Letter of Appearance by plaintiff. No appearance by Def. Judgment Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by plaintiff; Additional Text: by fax 2/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Goodman, Mark L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 21RG000376

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less