This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 11:45:17 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. PATRICIA TRUETT

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICIA TRUETT. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Keberlein, Bryan D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0791

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Keberlein, Bryan D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

500 Summit Lake Dr. Ste 400

Valhalla, NY 10595

Defendant

TRUETT, PATRICIA

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shindler, Keith Scott

Defendant Attorney

Wilson, Tyler Wayne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Mediation Orientation on June 3, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Keberlein, Bryan D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: SAC served 04-08-2021 ($75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 281519, Payable Number: 300111, Receipt Number: 21R 014099, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendant's Answer to claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendant's Answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on May 5, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: $5579.05--Summons and Complaint for monies mailed to defendant via US Postal Service on April 5, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 224555, Payable Number: 298293, Receipt Number: 21R 009998, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson, Tyler Wayne