This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 06:48:00 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. JULIE R KACZMAREK

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIE R KACZMAREK. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bjerke, Todd W and Wickler, Jody R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1572

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bjerke, Todd W

Wickler, Jody R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

500 Summit Lake Dr. Ste 400

Valhalla, NY 10595

Defendant

KACZMAREK, JULIE R

Onalaska, WI 54650

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shindler, Keith Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC001572; Caption: Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. JULIE R KACZMAREK; Total Amount: $8752.61; Judgment Party; Party Name: JULIE R KACZMAREK; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 401 4TH AVE S, Onalaska, WI 54650 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 500 SUMMIT LAKE DR. STE 400, Valhalla, NY 10595 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $8486.11; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter of appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Atty Shindler ask for 40 day continuance due to bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Atty Schindler req 40 day continuance for bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: UNCONTESTED ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009637, Payable Number: 187825, Receipt Number: 21R 015496, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less