This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 11:19:05 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. Jamie Keough

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jamie Keough. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Schubert, Robin M, Warner, Jessie J and Phillipson, Faun Marie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0451

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Schubert, Robin M

Warner, Jessie J

Phillipson, Faun Marie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

C/O Gurstel Law Firm P.C., 622 N Water St #400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Keough, Jamie

Albany, WI 53502-9720

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaminsky, Stephen M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Telephone message; Additional Text: Atty Miranda called with costs & AF to add to JU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schubert, Robin M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GREEN; Case number: 2021SC000451; Caption: Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. Jamie Keough; Total Amount: $1793.89; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jamie Keough; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 700 Vine St, Albany, WI 53502-9720 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Gurstel Law Firm P.C., 622 N Water St #400, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1527.39; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Court Reporter: Knox, Christine; Additional Text: Defendant Jamie Keough not in court. Attorney Christen Miranda appeared by video means for Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Atty Miranda requests a default judgment. Court grants default judgment. Atty Miranda will contact the clerk of courts office to give granted filing/service/atty fee's.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Warner, Jessie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004508, Payable Number: 87896, Receipt Number: 21R 007058, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on November 1, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaminsky, Stephen M.