This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 06:55:06 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs. BRANDON W MILLER

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDON W MILLER. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Schubert, Robin M and Phillipson, Faun Marie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0435

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Schubert, Robin M

Phillipson, Faun Marie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

500 Summit Lake Dr. Ste 400

Valhalla, NY 10595

Defendant

MILLER, BRANDON W

Brodhead, WI 53520

Garnishee

Corporate Contractors Inc

3800 Gateway Blvd #200

Beloit, WI 53511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shindler, Keith Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for CAVALRY SPV I, LLCMILLER, BRANDON WCorporate Contractors Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004831, Payable Number: 88100, Receipt Number: 21R 007417, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004831, Payable Number: 88100, Receipt Number: 21R 007417, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: GREEN; Case number: 2021SC000435; Caption: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs. BRANDON W MILLER; Total Amount: $1709.51; Judgment Party; Party Name: BRANDON W MILLER; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 107 8TH ST, Brodhead, WI 53520 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 500 SUMMIT LAKE DR. STE 400, Valhalla, NY 10595 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1593.01; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Court Reporter: Knox, Christine; Additional Text: 10 am Attorney Keith Scott Shindler appeared by video means for Plaintiff CAVALRY SPV I, LLC. Defendant BRANDON W MILLER not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schubert, Robin M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004307, Payable Number: 87733, Receipt Number: 21R 006871, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on October 18, 2021 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court events are currently held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less