This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 13:20:43 (UTC).

Cash Link USA LLC vs. JULIE SAMMONS

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Cash Link USA LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIE SAMMONS. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Martens, Todd K and Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0129

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Martens, Todd K

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cash Link USA LLC

1901 W 47Th Pl, Ste 1

Mission, KS 66205

Defendant

SAMMONS, JULIE

West Bend, WI 53095

Garnishees

Isle of Dogs Corporation, A

N118W18531 Bunsen Dr, Attn Payroll/Garnishments

Germantown, WI 53022-6318

Voeller Mixers Inc, B

369 W Western Ave, Attn: Payroll/Garnishments

Port Washington, WI 53074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackelly, Meghan Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for SAMMONS, JULIE; Additional Text: "B" Garnishee: Voeller Mixers Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 154282, Payable Number: 159889, Receipt Number: 21R 018959, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 154282, Payable Number: 159889, Receipt Number: 21R 018959, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for SAMMONS, JULIE; Additional Text: "A" Garnishee: Isle of Dogs Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 096541, Payable Number: 156538, Receipt Number: 21R 011342, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 096541, Payable Number: 156538, Receipt Number: 21R 011342, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 039267, Payable Number: 154160, Receipt Number: 21R 005609, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Martens, Todd K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WASHINGTON; Case number: 2021SC000129; Caption: Cash Link USA LLC vs. JULIE SAMMONS; Total Amount: $1318.4; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: JULIE SAMMONS; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1526 VOGT DR APT 11, West Bend, WI 53095 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cash Link USA LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1901 W 47th Pl, Ste 1, Mission, KS 66205 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1012.9; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $41.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M; Additional Text: No appearance by defendant; default judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $1012.90 plus costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Russell, Theresa M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $41.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Julie Sammons on 2/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Clerk of Court to Defendant regarding procedure during COVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $1012.9; Additional Text: Return Date: 3/08/21 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 019530, Payable Number: 153007, Receipt Number: 21R 002491, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Loan Transaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackelly, Meghan Patricia