This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/08/2022 at 01:51:27 (UTC).

Carolyn S Bjerke vs. Cory R Kendhammer

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Carolyn S Bjerke filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cory R Kendhammer. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Horne, Scott L, Wickler, Jody R and Rauls, Abigail K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1320

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Horne, Scott L

Wickler, Jody R

Rauls, Abigail K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bjerke, Carolyn S

Holmen, WI 54636

Defendant

Kendhammer, Cory R

La Crosse, WI 54601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC001320; Caption: Carolyn S Bjerke vs. Cory R Kendhammer; Total Amount: $1496.5; Judgment Party; Party Name: Carolyn S Bjerke; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1600 Coranado Street, Holmen, WI 54636; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cory R Kendhammer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1717 Lakeshore Drive, La Crosse, WI 54601; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1400.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $96.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Horne, Scott L; Court Reporter: Stello, Michelle; Additional Text: PE w/o counsel, RE w/o counsel Court- continuance of small claims trial. EXHIBIT 1- revised spreadsheet EXHIBIT 2- ext message EXHIBIT 3- receipts Discussion of exhibits by plaintiff EXHIBIT 4- HOLMEN QUICK STOP EXHIBIT 5- KWIK TRIP ABBEY RD EXHIBIT 6- HOLMEN QUICK STOP Def discusses these exhibits Court- look at texts- whos $800 isn't that an acknowledgment? Def- that was acknowledgment of $1000 that had nothing to do with this. I paid that back Plaintiff- it is co mingled Discussion from both plantiff and def. Court- difficult to unravel expenses over many months and litt ath indicate clearly whether you were authorized. Starting point for decision is burden of proof. Plaintiff has burden to show evidence and show they weren't authorized. Def originally took position none were unauthorized. With respoect to many of the transactions its very difficult to go through months of expenses and come up w/ proof particular ones were unauthoriezed. Evident there was co mingling which I would expect. Taking testimony he took liberties to some degree. Question is how much has been documented and what I can conclude by pondereance of the evidence. He has acknowledged $263. Question is how much beyond that can I accept? Plaintiff references to $800. He indicates that was other than cc's. Court- going to accept the acknolegment in Exhibit 2 of $800 that was owed. In addition to $600. It may be true there are other unauthorized charges, but its not proven. COURT AWARDS JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFF FOR $1400 PLUS FEES AND COSTS. Court- will give a 5 min break to see if a payment agreement can be reached before judgment entered. Plaintiff- $400 w/in 30 days and then $100/ mo beginning on 4/1 with a judgment entered today Def- $100 is when I go back to work Court- that is between you two. WILL ENTER JUDGMENT TODAY. Def to complete FD w/ in 15 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit list; Additional Text: Provided by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Mediation hearing; Court Official: Rauls, Abigail K; Additional Text: mediation failed, set for court trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: from plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Horne, Scott L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: set for mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Mediation hearing on November 12, 2021 at 11:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 21R 013262

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less