This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 17:34:26 (UTC).

Carl M Fairbert Jr vs. Alexander S Fairbert et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Carl M Fairbert Jr filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alexander S Fairbert. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2948

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fairbert Jr, Carl M

Friendship, WI 53934

Defendants

Fairbert, Alexander S

Milton, WI 53563

Donn, Ashley N

Milton, WI 53563

Dunn, Ashley N

Milton, WI 53563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: Rent and damages; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Location: Video Conference: Zoom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Plaintiff's documents: Damage list and copy of Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Damage list; Additional Text: Damage list - unsure of amount requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Rent and damages on February 9, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Rent and damages on February 9, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 08:14 AM Plaintiff Carl M Fairbert Jr appeared by video means. Defendant Ashley N Dunn appeared by phone means. Defendant Alexander S Fairbert appeared by phone means. Defendants have moved; eviction portion is dismissed. Rent and damages scheduled for February 9, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: Activity: Eviction return date Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Notice to Quit & Acknowledgement (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Damage list; Additional Text: Damage list - $7356.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 08:22 AM Plaintiff Carl M Fairbert Jr appeared by video means. Defendant Ashley N Donn appeared by phone means. Defendant Alexander S Fairbert appeared by phone means. This matter is adjourned for one week; plaintiff was told defendants were moving. Adjourned for eviction proceedings scheduled for January 19, 2022 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Notice of Hearing Returned - Re-mailed to address on USPS address notification label (Defendant Alexander S Fairbert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned for eviction proceedings on January 12, 2022 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 08:56 AM Plaintiff Carl M Fairbert Jr appeared by video means. Defendant Ashley N Donn not in court. Defendant Alexander S Fairbert not in court. No Affidavit of Service. Plaintiff will file an Amended Summons and Complaint. Adjourned for eviction proceedings scheduled for January 12, 2022 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: Activity: Eviction return date Appearances by video/zoom: Court Official, Court Clerk, and all Parties referenced in hearing minutes as in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Eviction return date on December 15, 2021 at 08:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Pending service Eviction and claim for money: $3550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 035920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendants Alexander S Fairbert and Ashley N Donn

    Read MoreRead Less