This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 15:16:54 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Sasha Sandles

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sasha Sandles. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1178

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

C/O Blitt And Gaines, P.C. 731 N Jackson St., Suite 660

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Sandles, Sasha

Nashotah, WI 53058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olefsky, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation for Dismissal Non-Eviction Small Claims, filed by Atty Olefsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: cover letter dated 5/3/2021 filed by Atty Olefsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/prop. order of dismissal; Additional Text: filed by Atty Olefsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Herring, David; Additional Text: Signed by Commissioner Herring on May 3, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 014277, Payable Number: 434193, Receipt Number: 21R 015412, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Sasha Sandles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 2,819.54 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Sasha Sandles Service as to: All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olefsky, David