This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 05:42:52 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Farlen Bibb

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Farlen Bibb. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1795

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Bibb, Farlen

Greendale, WI 53129

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Herring, David; Additional Text: Signed on 7/26/2021 by Commissioner David Herring

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Herring, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Non-Service: Attempted service of an Authenticated Summons and Complaint as to the defendant, Farlen Bibb. Filed by Samantha M. Simanson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Bibb, Farlen; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Farlen Bibb Current: 5400 RAINBOW DR, Greendale, WI 53129 United States (Effective: 07-19-2021) Prior: 2500 N 124th St, Apt 107, Milwaukee, WI 53226 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Dismissal Order returned to sender with a forwarding address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Bibb, Farlen; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Farlen Bibb Current: 2500 N 124th St, Apt 107, Milwaukee, WI 53226 United States (Effective: 07-06-2021) Prior: 12965 ORIOLE LN, Brookfield, WI 53005-7709 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: As to Farlen Bibb, notice of document returned to sender. **Mailed to updated address.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Herring, David; Additional Text: This case is dismissed twenty days after the date of this Order unless good cause is shown within the twenty days why this order should not take effect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Farlen Bibb. Filed by Attorney Brian Anthony Chou

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 022415, Payable Number: 439201, Receipt Number: 21R 024526, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with Military Status Report filed on Farlen Bibb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 1,870.98 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Farlen Bibb Service as to: All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J