This case was last updated from Marathon County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 10:02:18 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Brittany M Low

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brittany M Low. This case was filed in Marathon County Courts, Marathon County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Moran, Michael K and Marcus, Sandra J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0378

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marathon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Moran, Michael K

Marcus, Sandra J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive, Ste. 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Low, Brittany M

Wausau, WI 54403-6353

Garnishees

Kelly Serivces

Troy, MI 48084

Aspirus

2200 Westwood Dr, Attn Payroll

Wausau, WI 54401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Garnishee: Aspirus $4,379.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 116333, Payable Number: 265100, Receipt Number: 21R 003693P, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 116333, Payable Number: 265100, Receipt Number: 21R 003693P, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 076752, Payable Number: 262524, Receipt Number: 21R 002200P, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Garnishee - Kelly Serivces $4,247.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 058489, Payable Number: 262236, Receipt Number: 21R 002033P, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 058489, Payable Number: 262236, Receipt Number: 21R 002033P, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MARATHON; Case number: 2021SC000378; Caption: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Brittany M Low; Total Amount: $4247.22; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Brittany M Low; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1201 LE MESSURIER ST, Wausau, WI 54403-6353 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive, Ste. 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $4130.72; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.; Additional Text: Case called 10:00 time block in Sara Quirt-Sann Memorial Courtroom. Clerk: Becca. Attorney James E Kachelski in court for Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. not in court. Defendant Brittany M Low not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Marcus, Sandra J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: Brittany Low

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return Date on March 17, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 038414, Payable Number: 260679, Receipt Number: 21R 001135P, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Affidavit Regarding Defendant's Military Status for: Brittany Low

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E