This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 09:30:53 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Nancy L Petroski

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nancy L Petroski. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A, Fredrickson, Jon E and Christensen, Samuel A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1379

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A

Fredrickson, Jon E

Christensen, Samuel A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. c/o Messerli & Kramer PA

3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Petroski, Nancy L

Kansasville, WI 53139

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 550603, Payable Number: 438496, Receipt Number: 21R 008162F, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment docketed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: RACINE; Case number: 2021SC001379; Caption: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Nancy L Petroski; Total Amount: $7064.54; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nancy L Petroski; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 25620 County Line Rd, Kansasville, WI 53139 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6797.04; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $153.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Pltf. by atty. and no app. by deft(s). Zoom appearance. Judgment plus CC granted. Attorney fees waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Pltf. by atty. and no app. by deft(s). Zoom appearance. Adjourned for service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on July 8, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 10, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $6797.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 313254, Payable Number: 432271, Receipt Number: 21R 004713F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J