This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:56:14 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. C/O Blitt and Gaines, P.C. vs. Deidra L Beadle

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Capital One Bank USA , N A C/O Blitt and Gaines, P C filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Deidra L Beadle. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Potter, Gregory J and Joosten, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Potter, Gregory J

Joosten, Cindy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. C/O Blitt and Gaines, P.C.

731 N Jackson Street, Suite 660

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Beadle, Deidra L

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54495

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olefsky, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Joosten, Cindy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021CV000058; Caption: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. C/O Blitt and Gaines, P.C. vs. Deidra L Beadle; Total Amount: $10604.85; Judgment Party; Party Name: Deidra L Beadle; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 410 19Th Ave S, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54495 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. C/O Blitt and Gaines, P.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 731 N Jackson Street, Suite 660, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $10254.35; Costs/Amount; Description: Costs and Disbursements; Amount: $350.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Potter, Gregory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Potter, Gregory J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion; Additional Text: for default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Additional Text: for default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Deidra Beadle - served February 20, 2021 @ 9:18 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001305, Payable Number: 124496, Receipt Number: 21R 001511, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olefsky, David