This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 14:19:56 (UTC).

Caitlin Coggon vs. ORTHO SMILES, S.C.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Caitlin Coggon filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORTHO SMILES, S C. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Carter, Lloyd V and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Carter, Lloyd V

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coggon, Caitlin

Oconomowoc, WI 53066

Defendant

ORTHO SMILES, S.C.

Oconomowoc, WI 53066

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Olson, Alan Charles

Yurk, Nicholas O.

Defendant Attorney

Witte, Douglas Edward

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Additional Text: Order following 12/16/2021 hearing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Matthew Kriewaldt shall appear for a supplemental examination before Commissioner Wendt on January 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. 2. Matthew Kriewaldt shall pay Plaintiff-Creditors attorney fees and costs in the amount of $1,365. Signed by Judge Carter on 12/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Court Reporter: Humpal, Cheryl; Additional Text: 02:07 PM Attorney Alan Charles Olson in court for Plaintiff Caitlin Coggon. Defendant ORTHO SMILES, S.C. in court by Dr. Matthew Kriewaldt. Attorney Douglas Edward Witte in court for Defendant ORTHO SMILES, S.C.. Case is called for hearing on contempt order from 11/16/21. Dr. Kriewaldt did not appear before the commissioner for the scheduled supplemental hearing nor did he purge his contempt by filing a financial disclosure statement. Attorney Witte makes statements regarding reasons why Dr. Kriewaldt did not appear on that day. Attorney Olson makes statements and also requests attorney fees. Court re-iterates contempt finding, continues contempt order and again orders Dr. Kriewaldt to comply with appearing before the supplemental commissioner. If he does NOT appear before the commissioner on the date agreed to on today's date, in court, court will issue a warrant for Matthew Kriewaldt. Court grants request by Attorney Olson for attorney fees. Attorney Olson to submit bill of his attorney fees he is requesting. Off the record - parties call commissioner Attorney Marjorie Wendt and agree to supplemental hearing on January 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Alan Olson in Support of Request For Costs, filed by Atty Alan Charles Olson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Proposed Order following 12/16/21 hearing, filed by Atty Alan Charles Olson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Motion hearing on December 16, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Additional Text: Capias fact sheet sent to Atty Alan Olson on 12/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Alan Olson in Support of Motion to Hold Matthew Kriewaldt in Contempt and for Sanctions, filed by Atty Olson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Notice of Motion and Motion to Hold Matthew Kriewaldt in Contempt and for Sanctions, filed by Atty Olson. **Reviewed by Judge Carter on December 1, 2021. There was already a contempt finding with a purge so issuance of warrant is now appropriate. Standard daytime warrant to appear before the court**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Additional Text: Electronically declined by Judge Lloyd V. Carter on 11/16/2021: signed order submitted by counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contempt order; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Additional Text: Signed by Judge Carter on 11/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Nicholas Yurk appears for Plaintiff, Caitlin Coggon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Motion hearing on April 30, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover letter dated 03/10/2021, filed by Atty Olson re: enclosed eFilings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Alan Olson. Filed by Atty Olson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: Notice of Motions and Motions to Strike and for Default Judgment, filed by Atty Olson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Carter, Lloyd V; Additional Text: Meet and Confer Order Regarding Scheduling. Signed by Judge Michael Bohren, Judge Lloyd Carter, and Judge Ralph Ramirez on October 26, 2020. Copy mailed to Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Letter, Received on 02/04/2021, from Dr. Matthew Kriewaldt, in response to case. **Reviewed by Judge Carter on 02/05/2021: I will consider this an "Answer" denying all claims in the complaint.**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001266, Payable Number: 426745, Receipt Number: 21R 001660, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less