This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 01/24/2022 at 04:10:31 (UTC).

Brandon L. Lackey vs. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Brandon L Lackey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Muehlbauer, James K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0371

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Muehlbauer, James K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lackey, Brandon L.

Fond Du Lac, WI 54937

Defendants

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

1900 West 18Th Avenue

West Bend, WI 53095

Karl's Transport, Inc.

975 Amron Avenue

Antigo, WI 54409

Jarchow, Terry H.

Aniwa, WI 54408

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Curtis, George W

Defendant Attorney

Goode, Andrea Pearson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Telephone scheduling conference; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1244 (262)335-4341; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on February 24, 2022 at 02:45 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $75.0; Additional Text: of personal service of Summons & Complaint on Terry H. Jarchow on 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $75.0; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint upon KARLS TRANSPORT on 8/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 135414, Payable Number: 159004, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Andrea P. Goode, for Defendants WB Mutual, Karl's Transport, and Terry Jarchow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Defendants' Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Atty A. Goode

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $65.0; Additional Text: auth'd copy of Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, and Complaint upon West Bend Mut Ins Co on 8/05/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: (see Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: with Jury Demand, filed by Atty George W Curtis/Apex Accident Attorneys LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 134532, Payable Number: 158459, Receipt Number: 21R 015727, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Goode, Andrea Pearson