This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/07/2022 at 21:30:47 (UTC).

Brandon Charles Olsen et al vs. Oliver Guzman Rodriguez et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Brandon Charles Olsen filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Oliver Guzman Rodriguez. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hepler, Todd J and Whaley, April L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0615

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hepler, Todd J

Whaley, April L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olsen, Brandon Charles

Lodi, WI 53555

Olsen, Leslie Elizabeth

Lodi, WI 53555

Defendants

Rodriguez, Oliver Guzman

Prairie Du Sac, WI 53578

Sobalvarro, Guadalupe Del Rosario Rodriguez

Gillett, WI 54124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: COLUMBIA; Case number: 2021SC000615; Caption: Brandon Charles Olsen et al vs. Oliver Guzman Rodriguez et al; Total Amount: $679.84; Judgment Party; Party Name: Brandon Charles Olsen; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 207 Elizabeth Street, Lodi, WI 53555; Judgment Party; Party Name: Leslie Elizabeth Olsen; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 207 Elizabeth Street, Lodi, WI 53555 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Oliver Guzman Rodriguez; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N1520 Hwy 188, Prairie du Sac, WI 53578 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Guadalupe Del Rosario Rodriguez Sobalvarro; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 11639 County Road H, Gillett, WI 54124 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $414.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $150.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Whaley, April L; Additional Text: Plaintiff Brandon Charles Olsen appeared in court, Plaintiff Leslie Elizabeth Olsen appeared in court, Defendant Oliver Guzman Rodriguez not in court, Defendant Guadalupe Del Rosario Rodriguez Sobalvarro not in court. Default judgment due to non-appearance by the defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Unable to serve Oliver Guzman Rodriguez the Summons and Complaint $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Unable to serve Guadalupe Del Rosario Rodriguez $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: $45.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: attachment to publication summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Olsen, Brandon Charles; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Brandon Charles Olsen Current: 207 Elizabeth Street, Lodi, WI 53555 (Effective: 09-14-2021) Prior: 207 Elizabeth Street, Lodii, WI 53555 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007447, Payable Number: 162260, Receipt Number: 21R 012680, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: - Oliver Guzman Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: - Guadalupe Del Rosario Rodriguez Sobalvarro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Crash Report

    Read MoreRead Less